IL SB2479 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 14 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-08 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Regional Transportation Authority Act. Requires that commuter rail trains stop and allow passengers to board and exit at all commuter rail stations. Effective immediately.
Title
METRA-COMMUTER SERVICE
Sponsors
Sen. Kwame Raoul [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-08 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2010-02-23 | Postponed - Transportation | |
2010-02-17 | Postponed - Transportation | |
2010-02-04 | Assigned to Transportation | |
2009-10-14 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-10-14 | First Reading | |
2009-10-14 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2479&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB2479.htm |