IL SB2473 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Compulsory Attendance Article of the School Code. Provides that a public school student shall be granted up to 5 days of excused absences in any school year for the reason of the mental or behavioral health of the student. Requires that a student whose absence is excused for this reason be provided the opportunity to make up any school work missed during the absence.
Title
SCH CD-ABSENCES-MENTAL HEALTH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-04-12 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Postponed - Education |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Education |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Education |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Assigned to Education |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Muñoz |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jennifer Bertino-Tarrant |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Christopher Belt |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
2020-01-19 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2020-01-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-01-19 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 26-1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |