IL SB2454 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0559
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0559
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Department of Transportation Law of the Civil Administrative Code of Illinois. Designates the Department of Transportation (instead of the Regional Transportation Authority) as the State agency responsible for overseeing the safety and security of rail fixed guideway public transportation systems in compliance with federal statutes concerning the public transportation safety program. Adds provisions governing immunity for the Department in administering the program. Makes corresponding changes in the Freedom of information Act, the Metropolitan Transit Authority Act, and the Regional Transportation Authority Act. Repeals the Bi-State Transit Safety Act. Effective immediately.
Title
STATE RAILWAY SAFETY OVERSIGHT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - House - Motion in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0559 |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Effective Date August 20, 2021 |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 112-000-000 |
2021-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-19 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2021-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 013-000-000 |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2021-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 21, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 014-000-000 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2705 | 2705-300 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 2705 | 2705-616 | New Code | See Bill Text |
20 | 2705 | 49.18 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
45 | 111 | Act | Repealed Code | Citation Text |
5 | 140 | 7.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 3605 | 9b | Amended Code | Citation Text |
70 | 3605 | 9c | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 3615 | 2.11 | Amended Code | Citation Text |