IL SB2421 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Failed on January 7 2025 - 100% progression
Action: 2025-01-07 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Carbon Dioxide Transport and Storage Protections Act. Defines terms. Provides that (i) title to pore space belongs to and is vested in the surface owner of the overlying surface estate, (ii) a conveyance of title to a surface estate conveys title to the pore space in all strata underlying the surface estate, and (iii) title to pore space may not be severed from title to the surface estate. Notwithstanding any other provision of law, prohibits the amalgamation of pore space under the Eminent Domain Act. Contains requirements for valid amalgamation. Requires the Illinois Emergency Management Agency to determine a fee for carbon sequestration by rule. Creates the Carbon Transportation and Sequestration Readiness Fund and makes a conforming change in the State Finance Act. Requires the Illinois Emergency Management Agency and the Department of Public Health to conduct training with specified requirements. Contains other provisions. Amends the Illinois Power Agency Act. Makes changes to the definition of "sequester". Removes language requiring specified facilities to be clean coal facilities. Makes other changes. Amends the Carbon Dioxide Transportation and Sequestration Act. Contains requirements for receiving a certificate of authority. Makes other changes. Amends the Environmental Protection Act. Requires any person seeking to sequester carbon dioxide in Illinois to first obtain a carbon sequestration permit from the Agency. Contains other provisions and makes other changes. Contains a severability provision. Effective immediately.
Title
CARBON DIOXIDE TRANSPORT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-01-07 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Re-assigned to Energy and Public Utilities |
2024-01-10 | Senate | Re-assigned to Energy and Public Utilities |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachel Ventura |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mike Simmons |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 31, 2023 |
2023-03-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Paul Faraci |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As March 24, 2023 |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Energy and Public Utilities |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura Fine |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3855 | 1-10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
20 | 3855 | 1-80 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 75 | 10 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 75 | 15 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
220 | 75 | 20 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 5.990 | New Code | See Bill Text |
415 | 5 | 21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 5 | 22.63 | New Code | See Bill Text |
415 | 5 | 3.121 | New Code | See Bill Text |
415 | 5 | 3.132 | New Code | See Bill Text |
415 | 5 | 3.133 | New Code | See Bill Text |
415 | 5 | 3.134 | New Code | See Bill Text |
415 | 5 | 3.136 | New Code | See Bill Text |
415 | 5 | 3.446 | New Code | See Bill Text |
415 | 5 | 3.447 | New Code | See Bill Text |
415 | 5 | 39 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 5 | 40 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
415 | 5 | 9.19 | New Code | See Bill Text |
415 | 5 | 9.20 | New Code | See Bill Text |