IL SB2378 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Compassionate Use of Medical Cannabis Pilot Program Act. Requires dispensing organizations to provide, at the time of dispensing, a detailed written explanation of the risks and benefits of medical cannabis usage to a qualifying patient or registered designated caregiver. Specifies the information that must be included in those written materials. Requires the dispensing organization to document the provision of those written materials and to retain that documentation for a period of not less than 5 years. Requires dispensing organizations to transmit certain information to the Prescription Monitoring Program established under the Illinois Controlled Substances Act each time medical cannabis is dispensed. Requires that information to be transmitted not more than 7 days after the date on which the medical cannabis is dispensed. Effective immediately.
Title
MEDICAL CANNABIS-INFORMATION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2016-03-10 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (EX) |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
410 | 130 | 130 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 130 | 150 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
410 | 130 | 225 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2378&GAID=13&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/SB/09900SB2378.htm |