IL SB2288 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Stalking No Contact Order Act and the Civil No Contact Order Act. Provides that an order issued under either of those Acts may require or recommend the respondent to undergo counseling for a specified duration with a social worker, psychologist, clinical psychologist, psychiatrist, family service agency, alcohol or substance abuse program, mental health center guidance counselor, agency providing services to elders, program designed for domestic violence abusers or any other guidance service the court deems appropriate. Provides that the court may order the respondent in any intimate partner relationship to report to an Illinois Department of Human Services protocol approved partner abuse intervention program for an assessment and to follow all recommended treatment.
Title
NO CONTACT ORDER-COUNSELING
Sponsors
Sen. Jil Tracy [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-07-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2018-07-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2018-07-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-27 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Postponed - Criminal Law |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Criminal Law; 010-000-000 |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Criminal Law |
2018-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Criminal Law |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading February 27, 2018 |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Second Reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Do Pass Criminal Law; 010-000-000 |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Assigned to Criminal Law |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2018-01-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2018-01-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jil Tracy |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
740 | 21 | 80 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
740 | 22 | 213 | Amended Code | Citation Text |