IL SB2235 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-04-08 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Employees Group Insurance Act of 1971. Provides that the failure of the State to make any payment to a provider for a period of 6 months may be considered by the provider to be a material breach of the contract by the State. Provides that a provider who has entered into a contract to provide services under the Act and who has not received any payment for services for a period of 6 months (1) may consider the contract null and void; (2) may opt out of the obligation to provide services under the terms and conditions of the contract; and (3) shall, upon providing notice to the State department, be deemed an out-of-network provider. Effective immediately.
Title
STATE EMPLOYEE GRP INS-PAYMENT
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2016-04-08 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2016-01-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |