IL SB2204 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 27 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-08-04 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the State Finance Act. Removes language concerning one-time or annual transfers from the General Revenue Fund to the University of Illinois Hospital Services Fund. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

FINANCE-U OF I HOSPITAL FUND

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-08-04SenateRule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
2017-05-02SenateAssigned to Appropriations II
2017-05-02SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 12, 2017
2017-04-27SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-04-27SenateFirst Reading
2017-04-27SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Kyle McCarter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
301056z-30Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback