IL SB2164 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0544
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0544
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that provisions restricting the transportation of students to certain vehicles does not apply to any motor vehicle of the first division or the second division while that vehicle is being operated by specified entities for the purpose of transporting students to or from any agrarian-related school activity. Effective immediately.
Title
STUDENT TRANSPORT-AGRARIAN
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0544 |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Effective Date August 20, 2021 |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-27 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 116-000-000 |
2021-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-24 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee; 011-000-000 |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Vehicles & Safety Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-27 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer |
2021-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 21, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Anderson |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Transportation; 020-000-000 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 15, 2021 |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Do Pass Transportation; 014-000-000 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Postponed - Transportation |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Transportation |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Neil Anderson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 11-1414.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |