IL SB2164 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Municipal Code. Provides that any county or municipality may establish a code hearing unit. Sets forth requirements for hearing proceedings, notices, subpoenas, continuances, evidence at hearings, rights of occupants in eviction proceedings, defenses, findings and decisions, administrative review, judgments, and sanctions concerning sanitation and building code violations. Repeals a provision concerning the adoption of the Division by a municipality. Effective immediately.
Title
MUNI CD-SANITATION VIOLATIONS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-18 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - Local Government |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-10 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-10 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dave Syverson |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=2164&GAID=11&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SB/09700SB2164.htm |