IL SB2104 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-06-26 - Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the School Code. Provides that the school board and other employers shall make available to each active teacher who is an elected trustee of the Board of Trustees of the Public School Teachers' Pension and Retirement Fund of Chicago up to 22 days of paid leave of absence per year for the purpose of attending meetings of the Board of Trustees, committee meetings of the Board of Trustees, and seminars regarding issues for which the Board of Trustees is responsible. Provides that the allocation of the days of paid leave shall be at the discretion of the Board of Trustees. Amends the State Mandates Act to require implementation without reimbursement.
Title
SCH CD-CTPF-TEACHER TRUSTEE
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-26 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2023 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2023 |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Do Pass Senate Special Committee on Pensions; 010-000-000 |
2023-03-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Senate Special Committee on Pensions |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Senate Special Committee on Pensions |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate Special Committee on Pensions |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert F. Martwick |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
105 | 5 | 24-6.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 805 | 8.47 | New Code | See Bill Text |