IL SB1920 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-20 - Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 18 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-20 - Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Cook County Article of the Illinois Pension Code. Provides that salary shall be equal to the actual salary paid as reported to the Fund, excluding overtime or extra service and subject to certain specified limitations. Eliminates the statutory addition to salary for free meals, lodging, board, and laundry service. Provides that salary at the date of disability shall be based on the percentage, not to exceed 100%, of hours paid, contributed on, and reported to the Fund during the prior 365 days divided by 2080. Provides that this amendatory Act is intended to be a restatement and clarification of existing law. Effective immediately.
Title
PENCD-COOK-SALARY
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-31 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 39 N: 78 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-05-31 - House - Motion in House (Y: 66 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-31 - House - Motion in House (Y: 66 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-31 - House - Motion in House (Y: 64 N: 53 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-31 - House - Motion in House (Y: 59 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-31 - House - Motion in House (Y: 66 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-31 - House - Motion in House (Y: 66 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-31 - House - Motion in House (Y: 64 N: 53 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-31 - House - Motion in House (Y: 59 N: 59 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-18 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-20 | House | Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-11-27 | House | (M7) Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) December 20, 2013. |
2013-08-31 | House | (M7) Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) November 30, 2013. |
2013-05-31 | House | (M7) Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) August 31, 2013. |
2013-05-31 | House | Motion Filed to Reconsider Vote Rep. Lou Lang |
2013-05-31 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 039-078-001 |
2013-05-31 | House | Motion Prevailed |
2013-05-31 | House | Motion - Move to Previous Question Rep. Michael J. Madigan |
2013-05-31 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Pension Note Filed as Amended |
2013-05-31 | House | Motion Prevailed 066-052-000 |
2013-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Note / Motion Filed - Note Act Does Not Apply Rep. Elaine Nekritz; Pension Note |
2013-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Home Rule Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2013-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2013-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Prevailed 066-052-000 |
2013-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Note / Motion Filed - Note Act Does Not Apply Rep. Elaine Nekritz; Fiscal Note |
2013-05-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2013-05-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2013-05-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended - Withdrawn by Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2013-05-31 | House | Motion Prevailed 064-053-001 |
2013-05-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Note / Motion Filed - Note Act Does Not Apply Rep. Elaine Nekritz; Fiscal Note |
2013-05-31 | House | Chair Rules the Motion renewable |
2013-05-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion Lost 059-059-000; Fiscal Note |
2013-05-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Note / Motion Filed - Note Act Does Not Apply Rep. Elaine Nekritz; Fiscal Note |
2013-05-31 | House | Requested Roll Call on each Note-Rep. Reboletti |
2013-05-31 | House | Note / Motion Filed - Note Act Does Not Apply Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2013-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted |
2013-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Pension Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2013-05-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Pension Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2013-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Home Rule Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2013-05-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Home Rule Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2013-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2013-05-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 State Mandates Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2013-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2013-05-31 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Fiscal Note Requested as Amended by Rep. Dennis M. Reboletti |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2013-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Personnel and Pensions Committee; 006-004-000 |
2013-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Personnel and Pensions Committee |
2013-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-31 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2013-05-28 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-28 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-28 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-28 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 007-004-000 |
2013-05-28 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote |
2013-05-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2013-05-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-27 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2013-05-24 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2013 |
2013-05-21 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed |
2013-05-21 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Executive Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2013-05-21 | House | Assigned to Executive Committee |
2013-05-21 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2013 |
2013-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-24 | House | Assigned to Personnel and Pensions Committee |
2013-04-18 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-18 | House | First Reading |
2013-04-18 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Elaine Nekritz |
2013-04-18 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 17, 2013 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 012-000-000 |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Reported Back To Executive; 003-000-000 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | To Subcommittee on Special Issues (EX) |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Kwame Raoul |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 5 | 9-112 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 9-157 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
40 | 5 | 9-221 | Amended Code | Citation Text |