IL SB1918 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Income Tax Act. Provides for a credit against withholding taxes in an amount equal to the wages or salary paid by a private employer to an Illinois employee while the employee is on organ donation leave if the employer grants all of its employees the option of taking a paid leave of absence of at least 30 days for the purpose of serving as an organ donor or bone marrow donor. Provides that the credit may not exceed $1,000 for each employee who takes organ donation leave. Provides that such a leave of absence must be taken without loss of pay, vacation time, compensatory time, personal days, or sick time for at least the first 30 days of the leave of absence. Provides that the credit applies for reporting periods beginning on or after January 1, 2021. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

INCOME TAX-CREDIT-ORGAN DONOR

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-23 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-18HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2021-05-15HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2021-05-05HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maurice A. West, II
2021-05-04HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2021-04-30SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe
2021-04-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sara Feigenholtz
2021-04-28HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2021-04-28HouseFirst Reading
2021-04-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. C.D. Davidsmeyer
2021-04-26HouseArrived in House
2021-04-23SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2021-04-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2021-04-20SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 21, 2021
2021-04-20SenateSecond Reading
2021-04-20SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2021-04-15SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 20, 2021
2021-04-15SenateDo Pass Revenue; 008-000-000
2021-04-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2021-04-13SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2021-04-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler
2021-03-16SenateAssigned to Revenue
2021-02-26SenateReferred to Assignments
2021-02-26SenateFirst Reading
2021-02-26SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Julie A. Morrison

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
355704AAmended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback