IL SB1917 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on August 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0360
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Raffles and Poker Runs Act. Changes references to "statewide associations that represent law enforcement officials" to "associations that represent law enforcement officials" in provisions concerning licensing and raffles by law enforcement agencies and statewide associations that represent law enforcement officials.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

RAFFLES-LAW ENFORCEMENT AGENCY

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-09SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0360
2019-08-09SenateEffective Date January 1, 2020
2019-08-09SenateGovernor Approved
2019-06-21SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-23SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-23HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000
2019-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-02HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-01HouseDo Pass / Short Debate Executive Committee; 008-000-000
2019-04-30HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-04-09HouseAssigned to Executive Committee
2019-03-21HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-03-21HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-20HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2019-03-20HouseArrived in House
2019-03-20SenateThird Reading - Passed; 054-000-000
2019-03-07SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 12, 2019
2019-03-07SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2019-03-06SenateDo Pass Executive; 018-000-000
2019-03-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Executive
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. John G. Mulroe

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
230152Amended CodeCitation Text
230159Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback