IL SB1889 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0569
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Task Force on Human Services Contracting Act. Modifies the appointment of members to the Task Force on State Contracting with Private Nonprofit Human Service Providers. Provides, among other appointments, that 7 (currently, 6) members shall be appointed by the Senate Minority Leader and 7 (currently, 6) members shall be appointed by the Minority Leader of the House of Representatives. Provides that the Task Force shall submit a preliminary report to the Auditor General, the General Assembly, and the Governor no later than October 1, 2020 (currently, October 1, 2019), and a final report, along with recommendations and any proposed legislation, to the General Assembly and the Governor by January 1, 2021 (currently, January 1, 2020). Dissolves the Task Force and repeals the Act on January 1, 2022 (currently, January 1, 2021). Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

STATE CONTRACTING TASK FORCE

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-23SenatePublic Act . . . . . . . . . 101-0569
2019-08-23SenateEffective Date August 23, 2019
2019-08-23SenateGovernor Approved
2019-06-28SenateSent to the Governor
2019-05-31SenatePassed Both Houses
2019-05-31SenateSenate Concurs
2019-05-31SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 057-000-000
2019-05-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Human Services; 008-000-000
2019-05-28SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Human Services
2019-05-23SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments
2019-05-23SenateHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-05-23SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 24, 2019
2019-05-23SenateSecretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1
2019-05-23HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason
2019-05-23HouseThird Reading - Short Debate - Passed 114-000-000
2019-05-16HousePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-16HouseSecond Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-02HousePlaced on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate
2019-05-01HouseDo Pass as Amended / Short Debate Human Services Committee; 014-000-000
2019-05-01HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Human Services Committee; by Voice Vote
2019-04-30HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Human Services Committee
2019-04-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee
2019-04-23HouseHouse Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Michelle Mussman
2019-04-09HouseAssigned to Human Services Committee
2019-03-27HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-03-27HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-27HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2019-03-20HouseArrived in House
2019-03-20SenateThird Reading - Passed; 056-000-000
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 7, 2019
2019-03-06SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-05SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2019-03-05SenateDo Pass Human Services; 010-000-000
2019-02-27SenateAssigned to Human Services
2019-02-15SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-15SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-15SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20514010Amended CodeCitation Text
20514015Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback