IL SB1882 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the State Comptroller Act. Requires the Comptroller to post certain financial reports on its website (rather than delivering them to the legislative leaders and the chairpersons of the appropriation committees). Authorizes the Comptroller to publish interim financial reports, rather than a comprehensive annual financial report, under certain circumstances. Amends the State Finance Act. Authorizes, in any year, the State Comptroller to order transferred and the State Treasurer to transfer from the General Revenue Fund to the Education Assistance Fund, or the State Comptroller to order transferred and the State Treasurer to transfer from the Education Assistance Fund to the General Revenue Fund, the amounts required to honor vouchers presented by the State Universities Retirement System, a public institution of higher education, or the State Board of Education. Effective immediately.
Title
COMPTROLLER-RECORDS/FEES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-04-12 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-12 | House | First Reading |
2013-04-12 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Wayne Rosenthal |
2013-04-12 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 052-000-000 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Wm. Sam McCann |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 14, 2013 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2013 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended State Government and Veterans Affairs; 011-000-000 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to State Government and Veterans Affairs |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Andy Manar |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 405 | 19 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
15 | 405 | 19.5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
30 | 105 | 6z-21 | Amended Code | Citation Text |