IL SB1870 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Charitable Games Act. Defines "house-backed game" and "player-backed game". Provides that certain bond requirements do not apply to player-backed games. Provides that the limit on the number of charitable games events that may be held in any one premises per calendar year do not apply to charitable games events held at a municipal building. Removes language limiting the management or operation of the games to no more than 4 charitable games events during a calendar year. Provides that a municipality may provide the same premises for conducting charitable games nights every Friday, Saturday, and Sunday (rather than for conducting 16 charitable games nights during a 12-month period). Makes other changes related to restrictions on the conduct of charitable games.
Title
CHARITABLE GAMES-VARIOUS
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Executive |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Steven M. Landek |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
230 | 30 | 2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 30 | 4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 30 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 30 | 5.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
230 | 30 | 8 | Amended Code | Citation Text |