IL SB1853 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0294
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on August 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-09 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0294
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Private Detective, Private Alarm, Private Security, Fingerprint Vendor, and Locksmith Act of 2004. Provides an exemption from the requirements of fingerprint vendors to any member of local law enforcement (A) in the performance of his or her duties and (B) within a county without a local fingerprint vendor. Provides that local law enforcement agencies may charge a reasonable fee related to the cost of offering fingerprinting services. Effective immediately.
Title
FINGERPRINT VENDOR-EXEMPTIONS
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Bivins [R] | Rep. Jim Sacia [R] | Rep. Mike Smiddy [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-16 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-09 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0294 |
2013-08-09 | Senate | Effective Date August 9, 2013 |
2013-08-09 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-16 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-16 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2013-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Smiddy |
2013-05-10 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-10 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-09 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-08 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 007-000-000 |
2013-04-29 | House | Assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2013-04-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-29 | House | First Reading |
2013-04-29 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jim Sacia |
2013-04-25 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2013 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 12, 2013 |
2013-04-11 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities and Pensions; 010-000-000 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 19, 2013 |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-03-18 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Tim Bivins |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Tim Bivins |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 447 | 31-5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |