IL SB1775 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on August 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0521
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on August 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-08-23 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0521
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Allows insurance companies to provide insurance cards in electronic format. Allows motorists to provide proof of insurance through display of an electronic image on a portable electronic device. Provides that display of an electronic image in this manner does not constitute consent for a law enforcement officer, court, or officer of the court to access other contents of the electronic device.
Title
INSURANCE E-CARD
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-28 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-23 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-08-23 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 98-0521 |
2013-08-23 | Senate | Effective Date August 23, 2013 |
2013-08-23 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2013-06-26 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2013-05-28 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2013-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 059-000-000 |
2013-05-28 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2013-05-24 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-24 | Senate | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. William R. Haine |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 24, 2013 |
2013-05-23 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2013-05-23 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Mike Fortner |
2013-05-23 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2013-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2013-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-17 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-15 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2013-05-14 | House | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Insurance Committee; 022-000-000 |
2013-05-14 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Insurance Committee; by Voice Vote |
2013-05-10 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 24, 2013 |
2013-05-08 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Insurance Committee |
2013-05-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-05-07 | House | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Derrick Smith |
2013-05-06 | House | Assigned to Insurance Committee |
2013-05-03 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios |
2013-05-01 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Derrick Smith |
2013-04-29 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2013-04-29 | House | First Reading |
2013-04-24 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Maria Antonia Berrios |
2013-04-24 | House | Arrived in House |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 054-000-000 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Connelly |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 23, 2013 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Haine |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Recalled to Second Reading |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Insurance; 008-000-000 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Insurance |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 11, 2013 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. William E. Brady |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve Stadelman |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Insurance; 008-000-000 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Postponed - Insurance |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-02-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. William R. Haine |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
625 | 5 | 7-602 | Amended Code | Citation Text |