IL SB1770 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-5)
Status: Vetoed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-15 - Total Veto Stands
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-15 - Total Veto Stands
Text: Latest bill text (Veto Message) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Interagency Wetland Policy Act of 1989. Provides that the Act does not apply to construction activities at property or facilities covered by the Alexander-Cairo Port District Act if (i) the property or facilities are located within 6 miles of the confluence of the Ohio River and the Mississippi River and (ii) such actions comply with the applicable mitigation requirements of 40 CFR Part 230.
Title
CAIRO PORT DISTRICT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-05-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-15 | Senate | Total Veto Stands |
2021-08-31 | Senate | Placed Calendar Total Veto |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Governor Vetoed |
2021-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2021-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-000-000 |
2021-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Be Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2021-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-30 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Christopher Belt |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 31, 2021 |
2021-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2021-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 113-000-000 |
2021-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2021-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted State Government Administration Committee; 008-000-000 |
2021-05-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to State Government Administration Committee |
2021-05-28 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2021 |
2021-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2021-05-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Paul Jacobs |
2021-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patrick Windhorst |
2021-05-25 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-25 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate State Government Administration Committee; 007-000-000 |
2021-05-24 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 073-042-000 |
2021-05-24 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Carol Ammons |
2021-05-24 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 28, 2021 |
2021-05-24 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2021-05-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-21 | House | First Reading |
2021-05-21 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2021-05-21 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Tabled Pursuant to Rule 5-4(a) |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 21, 2021 |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-05-20 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading May 20, 2021 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Waive Posting Notice |
2021-05-14 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 21, 2021 |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donald P. DeWitte |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Steve McClure |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Darren Bailey |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sally J. Turner |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Postponed - Executive |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 21, 2021 |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As May 14, 2021 |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As May 7, 2021 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee/3rd Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Re-assigned to Executive |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 23, 2021 |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Elgie R. Sims, Jr. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | To Executive- Procurement |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Christopher Belt |