IL SB1760 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Insurance Code in the provision concerning credit allowed a domestic ceding insurer. Provides that credit shall also be allowed when reinsurance is ceded to an assuming insurer that holds surplus, or its equivalent, in excess of $250 million and the Director of Insurance determines that it is an acceptable credit risk. Provides that in determining whether credit should be allowed, the Director shall consider certain factors. Effective immediately.
Title
INS CD-DOMESTIC CEDING INSURER
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-18 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2011-03-17 | Senate | Postponed - Insurance |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Postponed - Insurance |
2011-03-09 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Antonio Mu |
2011-03-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Millner |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Sponsor Removed Sen. Antonio Mu |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Assigned to Insurance |
2011-03-02 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Antonio Mu |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Mike Jacobs |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 5 | 173.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1760&GAID=11&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SB/09700SB1760.htm |