IL SB1751 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-09 - House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Title Insurance Act. In provisions concerning choice of title insurance company, provides that it is the public policy of the State that consumers obligated to pay for title insurance services are afforded the opportunity to make an informed decision and, in so doing, have the option to consult with legal counsel before title insurance payment obligations are effective.
Title
TITLE INSURANCE-CONSULTATIONS
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Hastings [D] | Rep. Kambium Buckner [D] | Rep. Norine Hammond [R] | Rep. Charles Meier [R] |
Rep. Tom Weber [R] | Rep. Marcus Evans [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-23 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-05-09 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(b) / Motion Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-11 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 003-002-000 |
2022-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Referred to Rules Committee |
2022-04-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 3 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2022-04-08 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2022-03-31 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) April 8, 2022 |
2022-02-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion Filed to Table Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2022-02-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion Filed to Table Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2022-02-24 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2022-01-21 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2022-01-11 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2022-01-11 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Consumer Protection Committee |
2021-11-29 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-11-29 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-10-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2021-10-28 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2021-10-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Weber |
2021-10-28 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Charles Meier |
2021-10-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Rules Refers to Consumer Protection Committee |
2021-10-27 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Norine K. Hammond |
2021-10-27 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2021-10-27 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. William Davis |
2021-10-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-10-27 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. William Davis |
2021-10-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-10-14 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2021-09-08 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2021-09-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rule 19(c) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-09-08 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-09-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anne Stava-Murray |
2021-09-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2021-09-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2021-09-08 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Executive Committee |
2021-09-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-09-03 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2021-09-03 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-09-03 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-002-000 |
2021-06-02 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2021-05-28 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2021 |
2021-05-26 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-26 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2021-05-11 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Financial Institutions Committee; 010-000-000 |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Financial Institutions Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-28 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2021-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 058-000-000 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 22, 2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 21, 2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Do Pass Judiciary; 008-000-000 |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 23, 2021 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Assigned to Judiciary |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael E. Hastings |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
215 | 155 | 18.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |