IL SB1591 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Medicaid Revenue Act. Requires the Department of Healthcare and Family Services, in accordance with the federal Patient Protection and Affordable Care Act, to establish a Basic Health Program within its existing Medicaid managed care and care coordination programs in order to help serve the health care needs of individuals earning between 133% and 200% of the federal poverty level. Provides that the Department shall ensure full implementation of the Basic Health Program by January 1, 2014 and shall take all necessary steps to ensure that the State of Illinois is eligible for, and receives, the enhanced federal matching funds available to serve this currently underserved population.
Title
MEDICAID-BASIC HEALTH PROGRAM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2011-03-18 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2011-03-10 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2011-03-01 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2011-02-23 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2011-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2011-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Antonio Mu |
Code Citations
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1591&GAID=11&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/SB/09700SB1591.htm |