IL SB1533 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0524
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 20 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-20 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0524
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Wildlife Code. Provides that a veteran who is certified by the Department of Veterans' Affairs to be at least 10% disabled with service related disabilities or who is in receipt of total disability pension may trap, as permitted by the Code, without procuring a trapping license. Provides further that a military member returning from mobilization and service outside the United States who is an Illinois resident may trap, as permitted by the Code, without paying any fees required to obtain a trapping license, if he or she applies for the license within 2 years after returning from service abroad or after mobilization. Adds trapping licenses to the terminally ill hunter licensing program. Provides that persons on active duty in the Armed Forces or Illinois residents with a Type 1 or Type 4, Class 2 disability as defined in the Illinois Identification Card Act may trap, as permitted by the Code, without procuring a trapping license. Adds definitions. Effective immediately.
Title
WLDLF CD-TRAPPNG LICNSE EXMPT
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-05-26 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-20 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0524 |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Effective Date August 20, 2021 |
2021-08-20 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-26 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-26 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 112-000-000 |
2021-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-13 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Agriculture & Conservation Committee; 007-000-000 |
2021-05-04 | House | Assigned to Agriculture & Conservation Committee |
2021-04-26 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Lance Yednock |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Eva-Dina Delgado |
2021-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 059-000-000 |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Rachelle Crowe |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Karina Villa |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terri Bryant |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Win Stoller |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale Fowler |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Darren Bailey |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Brian W. Stewart |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 23, 2021 |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Do Pass Agriculture; 013-000-000 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Darren Bailey |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Agriculture |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jil Tracy |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Neil Anderson |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patrick J. Joyce |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
520 | 5 | 1.2q-1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
520 | 5 | 1.2q-2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
520 | 5 | 2.37 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
520 | 5 | 3.1-2 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
520 | 5 | 3.1-4 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
520 | 5 | 3.1-7 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
520 | 5 | 3.3 | Amended Code | Citation Text |