IL SB1490 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-05-10 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Financial Institutions Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
STATE GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-8 (b-1), the following amendments will remain in the Committee on Assignments. |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Steven M. Landek |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Judiciary; 005-000-000 |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Judiciary |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. John F. Curran |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John F. Curran |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 29, 2022 |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 8, 2022 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 13, 2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Dan McConchie |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1205 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |