IL SB1489 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0444
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-08-25 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0444
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Emergency Management Agency Act. Provides that the Illinois Emergency Management Agency may by rule assess and collect reasonable fees for attendance at Agency-sponsored conferences and trainings to enable the Agency to carry out the requirements of the Act. Provides that any moneys received from these fees shall be deposited in the Emergency Planning and Training Fund and used by the Agency, subject to appropriation, for planning and training activities.
Title
IEMA-CONFERENCE-TRAINING-FEES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-30 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-25 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 100-0444 |
2017-08-25 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2018 |
2017-08-25 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2017-05-31 | Senate | Senate Concurs |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 056-000-000 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt State Government; 008-000-000 |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to State Government |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-31 | Senate | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. Sue Rezin |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2017-05-30 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 115-000-000 |
2017-05-30 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-30 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-05-30 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-28 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 005-000-000 |
2017-05-26 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2017 |
2017-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-05-25 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-23 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-23 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Appropriations-Public Safety Committee; 014-000-000 |
2017-05-19 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017 |
2017-05-03 | House | Assigned to Appropriations-Public Safety Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-26 | House | First Reading |
2017-04-26 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-04-26 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 057-000-000 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 25, 2017 |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2017 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Do Pass State Government; 008-000-000 |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Assigned to State Government |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Sue Rezin |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 3305 | 5 | Amended Code | Citation Text |