IL SB1462 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0550
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-08-11 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0550
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Gambling Act. Provides that to be eligible for an occupational license, an applicant must not have been convicted of a felony offense, a violation of specified laws, or a similar statute of any other jurisdiction if the applicant will perform any function involved in gaming by patrons (rather than must not have been convicted of a specified offense); and an applicant must not have been convicted of a crime involving dishonesty or moral turpitude if the applicant will perform any function involved in gaming by patrons (rather than must not have been convicted of a crime involving dishonesty or moral turpitude). Provides that the Illinois Gaming Board may in its discretion refuse an occupational license to any person who has a background that poses a threat to the public interests of the State or to the security and integrity of gaming. Sets forth provisions that the Board shall consider when considering criminal convictions of an applicant. Amends the Illinois Administrative Procedure Act. Provides for emergency rulemaking.
Title
GAMING-OCCUP LICENSE STANDARD
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-25 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 78 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 44 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-29 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 44 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-11 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 103-0550 |
2023-08-11 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2024 |
2023-08-11 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2023-06-23 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2023-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Cyril Nichols |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2023-05-25 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 078-027-000 |
2023-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Nicholas K. Smith |
2023-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Edgar Gonzalez, Jr. |
2023-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2023-05-25 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jawaharial Williams |
2023-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2023-05-24 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2023-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-05-24 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2023-05-24 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2023-05-24 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Gaming Committee; 013-003-000 |
2023-05-24 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 004-000-000 |
2023-05-24 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 21 Gaming Committee; Rep. Barbara Hernandez |
2023-05-24 | House | Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2023 |
2023-05-24 | House | Assigned to Gaming Committee |
2023-04-28 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2023-04-18 | House | Assigned to Gaming Committee |
2023-04-12 | House | Alternate Co-Sponsor Removed Rep. Norma Hernandez |
2023-04-12 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2023-03-30 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2023-03-30 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-30 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Kam Buckner |
2023-03-30 | House | Arrived in House |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Willie Preston |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 044-012-000 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 24, 2023 |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted; Peters |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommend Do Adopt Executive; 010-001-000 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Executive |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 7, 2023 |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 008-004-000 |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2023-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Robert Peters |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
230 | 10 | 9 | Amended Code | Citation Text |