IL SB1448 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Commercial Transportation Law of the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that every rail carrier operating in this State transporting firearms or firearm ammunition through a municipality with a population of more than 1,000,000 inhabitants shall notify the local municipal law enforcement agency at least 24 hours prior to transporting the firearms or firearm ammunition through the municipality.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

VEH CD-RAIL TRANSPORT-FIREARMS

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017
2017-04-26SenateSecond Reading
2017-04-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 25, 2017
2017-04-06SenateDo Pass as Amended Transportation; 013-002-000
2017-04-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2017-03-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Patricia Van Pelt
2017-03-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2017-03-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2017-03-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr.
2017-03-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2017-03-29SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter
2017-03-28SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2017-03-17SenateRule 2-10 Committee Deadline Established As April 7, 2017
2017-03-15SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation
2017-03-15SenatePostponed - Transportation
2017-03-09SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2017-03-08SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Transportation
2017-03-08SenatePostponed - Transportation
2017-02-28SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Transportation
2017-02-23SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2017-02-23SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III
2017-02-22SenateAssigned to Transportation
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Emil Jones, III

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
625518c-7404.5New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback