IL SB1409 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-12 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. M. Maggie Crotty
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-12 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. M. Maggie Crotty
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Illinois Vacant and Abandoned Properties Act. Contains only a short title provision.
Title
VACANT & ABANDONED PROP-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-12 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. M. Maggie Crotty | |
2009-03-10 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael Noland | |
2009-02-27 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. A. J. Wilhelmi | |
2009-02-19 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Pamela J. Althoff | |
2009-02-19 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link | |
2009-02-18 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Ira I. Silverstein | |
2009-02-13 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Dale E. Risinger | |
2009-02-11 | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson | |
2009-02-11 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-11 | First Reading | |
2009-02-11 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1409&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB1409.htm |