IL SB1381 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-07 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 21 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-07 - Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Fire Sprinkler Contractor Licensing Act. Repeals a provision exempting certain persons or businesses engaged in the installation or repair of fire sprinkler systems from having a designated certified person. Effective immediately.
Title
FIRE SPRINKLER ACT-EXEMPTION
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-10-20 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-07 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2015-11-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 - November 10, 2015 |
2015-11-03 | Senate | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1 |
2015-10-20 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 111-001-001 |
2015-10-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Sue Rezin |
2015-10-20 | House | 3/5 Vote Required |
2015-10-20 | House | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2015-10-20 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-10-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-10-20 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Recommends Be Adopted Health Care Licenses Committee; 011-000-000 |
2015-10-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Rules Refers to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2015-10-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-10-19 | House | House Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Frank J. Mautino |
2015-10-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-10-14 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) October 31, 2015 |
2015-10-14 | House | Approved for Consideration Rules Committee; 003-001-000 |
2015-05-31 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2015-05-29 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-29 | House | Recalled to Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-29 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-27 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-27 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-22 | House | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 31, 2015 |
2015-05-14 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-14 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Business & Occupational Licenses Committee; 008-000-000 |
2015-05-08 | House | Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 15, 2015 |
2015-04-27 | House | Assigned to Business & Occupational Licenses Committee |
2015-04-21 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-21 | House | First Reading |
2015-04-21 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Patrick J. Verschoore |
2015-04-21 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 055-000-000 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 21, 2015 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Martinez |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Licensed Activities and Pensions; 010-000-000 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 14, 2015 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities and Pensions; 011-000-000 |
2015-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2015-03-19 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-02-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
225 | 317 | 120 | Repealed Code | Citation Text |