IL SB1379 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Reinserts the provisions of Senate Amendment 1 with changes. Removes conforming changes concerning income and expense data, but retains the new Article concerning income-producing property. Provides that the term "income and expense data" include specific federal income tax returns (in Senate Amendment 1, federal income tax returns generally). Provides that "income-producing property" means property that is not exclusively owner-occupied (in Senate Amendment 1, non-owner-occupied). Removes a reference to gas stations. Defines "owner-occupied" and "taxpayer". Provides that the chief county assessment officer shall notify taxpayers of their obligation to submit income and expense data. Makes changes concerning the submission of federal tax forms. Provides that the penalty for failure to submit income and expense data shall be 0.05% (instead of 0.5%) of the prior year's market value. Adds provisions concerning administrative hearings. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.
Title
PROP TX-INCOME PRODUCING PROP
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 16 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2021-01-08 | House | Suspend Rule 21 - Prevailed 066-039-000 |
2021-01-08 | House | Moved to Suspend Rule 21 Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2021-01-08 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2020-06-23 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2020-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer |
2020-02-20 | House | To Property Tax Subcommittee |
2020-02-04 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2020-01-20 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-11-04 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2019-10-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2019-10-04 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2019-09-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe |
2019-09-06 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II |
2019-05-29 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth |
2019-05-28 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech |
2019-05-27 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr. |
2019-05-22 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman |
2019-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner |
2019-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2019-05-20 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2019-05-17 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo |
2019-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-05-10 | House | Rule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-08 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2019-05-07 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner |
2019-04-24 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-04-04 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-04 | House | First Reading |
2019-04-04 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2019-04-04 | House | Arrived in House |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 036-016-001 |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 3, 2019 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Hutchinson |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 006-001-000 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Revenue; 008-000-000 |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Postponed - Revenue |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Assigned to Revenue |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2019-02-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 200 | 9-155 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 9-160 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
35 | 200 | 9-280 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 9-281 | New Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 200 | 9-6 | New Code | See Bill Text |