IL SB1379 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 60-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-06-23 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Reinserts the provisions of Senate Amendment 1 with changes. Removes conforming changes concerning income and expense data, but retains the new Article concerning income-producing property. Provides that the term "income and expense data" include specific federal income tax returns (in Senate Amendment 1, federal income tax returns generally). Provides that "income-producing property" means property that is not exclusively owner-occupied (in Senate Amendment 1, non-owner-occupied). Removes a reference to gas stations. Defines "owner-occupied" and "taxpayer". Provides that the chief county assessment officer shall notify taxpayers of their obligation to submit income and expense data. Makes changes concerning the submission of federal tax forms. Provides that the penalty for failure to submit income and expense data shall be 0.05% (instead of 0.5%) of the prior year's market value. Adds provisions concerning administrative hearings. Makes other changes. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

PROP TX-INCOME PRODUCING PROP

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 36 N: 16 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-23HouseRule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2020-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan "Yoni" Pizer
2020-02-20HouseTo Property Tax Subcommittee
2020-02-04HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2020-01-20SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Don Harmon
2019-11-04SenateChief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton
2019-10-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz
2019-10-04HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca
2019-09-11HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lindsey LaPointe
2019-09-06HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Curtis J. Tarver, II
2019-05-29HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jehan Gordon-Booth
2019-05-28HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel Didech
2019-05-27HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Frances Ann Hurley
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Lamont J. Robinson, Jr.
2019-05-22HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Michelle Mussman
2019-05-21HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kambium Buckner
2019-05-20HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly
2019-05-20HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard
2019-05-17HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. LaToya Greenwood
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Ann M. Williams
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Sara Feigenholtz
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr.
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2019-05-16HouseAdded Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski
2019-05-10HouseRule 19(a) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
2019-05-08HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley
2019-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Delia C. Ramirez
2019-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Cassidy
2019-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz
2019-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi
2019-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robyn Gabel
2019-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker
2019-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan
2019-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah
2019-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Celina Villanueva
2019-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. La Shawn K. Ford
2019-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita
2019-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter
2019-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers
2019-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Debbie Meyers-Martin
2019-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis
2019-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo
2019-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
2019-05-07HouseAdded Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Arthur Turner
2019-04-24HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2019-04-04HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2019-04-04HouseFirst Reading
2019-04-04HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. William Davis
2019-04-04HouseArrived in House
2019-04-04SenateThird Reading - Passed; 036-016-001
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Mattie Hunter
2019-04-04SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Terry Link
2019-04-03SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III
2019-03-28SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 3, 2019
2019-03-28SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted; Hutchinson
2019-03-28SenateSecond Reading
2019-03-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommend Do Adopt Revenue; 006-001-000
2019-03-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy
2019-03-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
2019-03-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Thomas Cullerton
2019-03-27SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2019-03-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters
2019-03-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins
2019-03-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Bill Cunningham
2019-03-27SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans
2019-03-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-26SenateSenate Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-03-25SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Fine
2019-03-19SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Pat McGuire
2019-03-07SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford
2019-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading
2019-03-06SenateDo Pass as Amended Revenue; 008-000-000
2019-03-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted
2019-03-06SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Iris Y. Martinez
2019-03-06SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Revenue
2019-03-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments
2019-03-04SenateSenate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson
2019-02-21SenatePostponed - Revenue
2019-02-20SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro
2019-02-13SenateAssigned to Revenue
2019-02-13SenateAdded as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon
2019-02-13SenateReferred to Assignments
2019-02-13SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-13SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Toi W. Hutchinson

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
352009-155Amended CodeCitation Text
352009-160Amended CodeCitation Text
352009-280New CodeSee Bill Text
352009-281New CodeSee Bill Text
352009-6New CodeSee Bill Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback