IL SB1311 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 26 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Committee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

Amends the Illinois Lottery Law. Requires the Department of the Lottery, on or before the last day of each fiscal year, to deposit any estimated remaining proceeds (rather than any remaining proceeds), after certain payments and transfers are made, into the Capital Projects Fund. Provides that the Department shall increase or decrease its deposit into the Capital Projects Fund each year by the amount that the actual expenditures either fell short of or exceeded the estimate used by the Department in making the deposit for the previous fiscal year. Effective immediately.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

LOTTERY-CAPITAL PROJECTS FUND

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19HouseCommittee Deadline Extended-Rule 9(b) May 26, 2017
2017-05-11HouseTo Finance Subcommittee
2017-05-03HouseAssigned to Revenue & Finance Committee
2017-04-26HouseReferred to Rules Committee
2017-04-26HouseFirst Reading
2017-04-26HouseChief House Sponsor Rep. Fred Crespo
2017-04-26HouseArrived in House
2017-04-26SenateThird Reading - Passed; 058-000-000
2017-04-06SenateAdded as Co-Sponsor Sen. Jim Oberweis
2017-03-30SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017
2017-03-30SenateSecond Reading
2017-03-01SenatePlaced on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 2, 2017
2017-03-01SenateDo Pass State Government; 008-000-000
2017-02-15SenateAssigned to State Government
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Assignments
2017-02-09SenateFirst Reading
2017-02-09SenateFiled with Secretary by Sen. Dale A. Righter

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2016059.1Amended CodeCitation Text

Illinois State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback