IL SB1240 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Public Utilities Act. Requires all local exchange telecommunications carriers with at least 35,000 subscriber access lines, any person or entity providing cable service or video service, and any wireless telephone carrier and internet service provider serving Illinois residents to submit an annual report concerning procurement goals and actual spending for female-owned, minority-owned, veteran-owned, and small business enterprises. Effective immediately.
Title
UTILITY-SUPPLIER DIVERSITY
Sponsors
Sen. John Cullerton [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] | Sen. Napoleon Harris [D] | Sen. Kimberly Lightford [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2018-12-31 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. John J. Cullerton |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Postponed - Telecommunications and Information Technology |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - Telecommunications and Information Technology |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to Telecommunications and Information Technology |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. James F. Clayborne, Jr. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 5 | 5-117 | Amended Code | Citation Text |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1240&GAID=14&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=91&GA=100 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/100/SB/10000SB1240.htm |