IL SB0912 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on January 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-01-09 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Abused and Neglected Child Reporting Act. Provides that any person required to report under the Act shall complete no less than 4 hours of training every year to recognize signs of domestic violence against minors and non-minors. Provides that training may be conducted by any local domestic violence shelter, hospital, or other domestic violence advocacy group.
Title
ABUSED CHILD-REPORTER TRAINING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-09 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2017-08-04 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 4, 2017 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 16, 2017 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Human Services; 009-000-001 |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Human Services |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Postponed - Human Services |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Assigned to Human Services |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-02-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Melinda Bush |