IL SB0835 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-22 - Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Labor Dispute Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
EMPLOYMENT-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-22 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Emil Jones, III |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Melinda Bush |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2021-07-16 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura M. Murphy |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Laura Ellman |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As April 30, 2021 |
2021-04-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Ann Gillespie |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. David Koehler |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Kimberly A. Lightford |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Celina Villanueva |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Labor |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Robert Peters |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2021-03-31 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Ram Villivalam |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 13, 2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 25, 2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 016-000-000 |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-25 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-25 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Don Harmon |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
820 | 5 | 1.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |