IL SB0740 | 2013-2014 | 98th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Failed on January 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-01-13 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Public Aid Code. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the collection fee a court may impose on an individual who owes child or spouse support.
Title
PUBLIC AID-TECH
Sponsors
Sen. David Koehler [D] | Sen. Donne Trotter [D] | Sen. Martin Sandoval [D] | Sen. Jacqueline Collins [D] |
Sen. Heather Steans [D] | Sen. John Sullivan [D] | Sen. Michael Frerichs [D] | Sen. William Haine [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-13 | Senate | Session Sine Die |
2013-08-09 | Senate | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. William R. Haine |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Michael W. Frerichs |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. John M. Sullivan |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. David Koehler |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading May 31, 2013 |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Approved for Consideration Assignments |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Martin A. Sandoval |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Donne E. Trotter |
2013-05-30 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. David Koehler |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 31, 2013 |
2013-04-30 | Senate | Re-referred to Assignments |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Rule 2-10 Third Reading Deadline Established As May 3, 2013 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 16, 2013 |
2013-04-12 | Senate | Second Reading |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 21, 2013 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Do Pass Executive; 010-000-000 |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Assigned to Executive |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2013-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
305 | 5 | 10-10.1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |