IL SB0640 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0163
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on July 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-26 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0163
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Procurement Code. Provides that no procurement contract for the construction, alteration, operation, repair, maintenance, or improvement of any mass transit facility, or equipment thereof, in excess of $1,000,000 shall be awarded to or executed with any vendor that receives support from a nonmarket economy country, as defined under specified federal law. Provides that nothing in the provisions is intended to contravene any existing treaties, laws, trade agreements, or regulations of the United States or subsequent trade agreements entered into between any foreign countries and the State or the United States.
Title
PROCUREMENT-NONMARKET ECONOMY
Sponsors
Sen. Laura Murphy [D] | Sen. Jason Plummer [R] | Sen. Dan McConchie [R] | Rep. Martin Moylan [D] |
Rep. Dan Caulkins [R] | Rep. Thomas Morrison [R] | Rep. Deanne Mazzochi [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-21 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 111 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - Senate - Motion in Senate (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-26 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 102-0163 |
2021-07-26 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2022 |
2021-07-26 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2021-05-21 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2021-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Deanne M. Mazzochi |
2021-05-21 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Thomas Morrison |
2021-05-21 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - Passed 111-000-000 |
2021-05-14 | House | Third Reading - Consent Calendar - First Day |
2021-05-13 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-12 | House | Second Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Caulkins |
2021-05-05 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Consent Calendar |
2021-05-04 | House | Do Pass / Consent Calendar Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee; 013-000-000 |
2021-04-28 | House | Assigned to Transportation: Regulation, Roads & Bridges Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2021-04-23 | House | First Reading |
2021-04-22 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2021-04-22 | House | Arrived in House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 056-000-000 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading ** April 14, 2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Second Reading |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading April 13, 2021 |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Do Pass Commerce; 010-000-000 |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jason Plummer |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Dan McConchie |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Assigned to Commerce |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2021-02-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Laura M. Murphy |