IL SB0367 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-30 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Attorney General Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the Attorney General's oath and bond.
Title
STATE GOVERNMENT-TECH
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-31 - Senate - Concurrence in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-27 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-30 | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 96-0020 | |
2009-06-30 | Effective Date June 30, 2009 | |
2009-06-30 | Governor Approved | |
2009-06-30 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-06-01 | Passed Both Houses | |
2009-06-01 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Senate Concurs 058-000-000 | |
2009-06-01 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Senate Concurs 058-000-000 | |
2009-05-29 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Human Services; 006-000-000 | |
2009-05-29 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion To Concur Recommended Do Adopt Human Services; 006-000-000 | |
2009-05-29 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Human Services | |
2009-05-29 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Assignments Referred to Human Services | |
2009-05-29 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-29 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John J. Cullerton | |
2009-05-29 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Referred to Assignments | |
2009-05-29 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Motion to Concur Filed with Secretary Sen. John J. Cullerton | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on Calendar Order of Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 - May 28, 2009 | |
2009-05-27 | Secretary's Desk - Concurrence House Amendment(s) 1, 2 | |
2009-05-27 | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris | |
2009-05-27 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia | |
2009-05-27 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham | |
2009-05-27 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks | |
2009-05-27 | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 116-000-000 | |
2009-05-26 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-26 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Adopted by Voice Vote | |
2009-05-26 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Recommends Be Adopted Rules Committee; 004-000-000 | |
2009-05-22 | Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 29, 2009 | |
2009-05-21 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-05-21 | House Floor Amendment No. 2 Filed with Clerk by Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2009-05-19 | Held on Calendar Order of Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-19 | Second Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-19 | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate | |
2009-05-19 | Do Pass as Amended / Short Debate Executive Committee; 011-000-000 | |
2009-05-19 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted in Executive Committee; by Voice Vote | |
2009-05-19 | House Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Clerk by Executive Committee | |
2009-05-18 | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Madigan | |
2009-05-18 | Alternate Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie | |
2009-05-08 | Committee/Final Action Deadline Extended-9(b) May 22, 2009 | |
2009-04-01 | Assigned to Executive Committee | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-31 | First Reading | |
2009-03-31 | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Madigan | |
2009-03-31 | Placed on Calendar Order of First Reading | |
2009-03-31 | Arrived in House | |
2009-03-31 | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 | |
2009-03-24 | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 25, 2009 | |
2009-03-24 | Second Reading | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Do Pass Executive; 012-000-000 | |
2009-03-05 | Assigned to Executive | |
2009-02-06 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-06 | First Reading | |
2009-02-06 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |