IL SB0308 | 2017-2018 | 100th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 046-050-000
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-19 - Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 046-050-000
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Underground Utility Facilities Damage Prevention Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning the short title.
Title
PROFESSIONAL LIC-NONCITIZENS
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-19 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 46 N: 50 NV: 4 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 3 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 40 N: 3 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Lost 046-050-000 |
2017-05-18 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-18 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Camille Y. Lilly |
2017-05-18 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Silvana Tabares |
2017-05-17 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2017-05-17 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Health Care Licenses Committee; 009-004-001 |
2017-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2017-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2017-05-16 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Marcus C. Evans, Jr. |
2017-05-15 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2017-05-11 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Daniel J. Burke |
2017-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Luis Arroyo |
2017-05-10 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2017-05-09 | House | Assigned to Health Care Licenses Committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Added Alternate Co-Sponsor Rep. Theresa Mah |
2017-05-02 | House | Added Alternate Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2017-04-28 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2017-04-28 | House | First Reading |
2017-04-28 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2017-04-28 | House | Arrived in House |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 040-003-000 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading April 27, 2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Second Reading |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather A. Steans |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Napoleon Harris, III |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Daniel Biss |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Cristina Castro |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Don Harmon |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 28, 2017 |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Do Pass as Amended Licensed Activities and Pensions; 011-001-000 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Adopted |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Added as Co-Sponsor Sen. Omar Aquino |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Postponed - Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Assigned to Licensed Activities and Pensions |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Iris Y. Martinez |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2017-01-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
220 | 50 | 1 | Amended Code | Citation Text |