IL SB0296 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-13 - Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the Illinois Diesel Emissions Reduction Act. Creates the Illinois Diesel Emissions Reduction Funding Program and the Diesel Emissions Reduction Fund. Provides that moneys in the Fund shall be used only to implement the Funding Program. Requires the collection of a surcharge on the retail sale or lease of certain diesel vehicles that are of a model year 2006 or earlier and are not equipped with Level 3 Controls. Requires a similar surcharge on the registration of certain diesel vehicles. Requires the Illinois Environmental Protection Agency, in consultation with the State Treasurer and after notice and public comment, to promulgate rules to establish and implement the Diesel Emissions Reduction Funding Program. Sets out guidelines for the administration of the Diesel Emissions Reduction Funding Program and the corresponding grant and rebate programs. Provides that the Agency may seek injunctive relief in any court of competent jurisdiction to enforce any provision of the Funding Program. Amends the Illinois Vehicle Code. Provides that the Secretary of State shall require additional information with the registration of a diesel motor vehicle to support a reliable and complete inventory of diesel motor vehicles in the State. Provides that the Secretary of State, in consultation with the Illinois Department of Transportation and the Agency, shall, promulgate regulations by October 1, 2010 to develop a program for registration of diesel nonroad vehicles, locomotives, and diesel marine vessels, and shall implement the program beginning January 1, 2010. Contains other provisions. Effective immediately.
Title
DIESEL EMISSIONS REDUCTION
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-13 | Rule 3-9(a) / Re-referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-12 | Held in Environment | |
2009-02-26 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2009-02-18 | Assigned to Environment | |
2009-02-06 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-02-06 | First Reading | |
2009-02-06 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Michael Noland |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=296&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB0296.htm |