IL SB0086 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-10 - Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0018
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Counties Code. Provides that a default in the payment of a fine or penalty or any installment of a fine or penalty may be collected by any means authorized for the collection of monetary judgments. Allows the state's attorney of the county in which the fine or penalty was imposed to retain attorneys and private collection agents for the purpose of collecting any fine or penalty or installment of a fine or penalty. Provides that any fees incurred with respect to such attorneys or private collection agents shall be charged to the offender.
Title
CTY CD-ADMIN ORDER FINES
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-07 - House - Third Reading in House (Y: 112 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading in Senate (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-10 | Senate | Public Act . . . . . . . . . 99-0018 |
2015-07-10 | Senate | Effective Date January 1, 2016 |
2015-07-10 | Senate | Governor Approved |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Sent to the Governor |
2015-05-07 | Senate | Passed Both Houses |
2015-05-07 | House | Third Reading - Short Debate - Passed 112-000-000 |
2015-05-06 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-05-06 | House | Second Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-29 | House | Placed on Calendar 2nd Reading - Short Debate |
2015-04-28 | House | Do Pass / Short Debate Judiciary - Civil Committee; 011-000-000 |
2015-04-20 | House | Assigned to Judiciary - Civil Committee |
2015-04-14 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-04-14 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-27 | House | Chief House Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks |
2015-03-27 | House | Arrived in House |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Third Reading - Passed; 053-000-000 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 3rd Reading March 19, 2015 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 12, 2015 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Do Pass Local Government; 010-000-000 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Assigned to Local Government |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Assignments |
2015-01-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Filed with Secretary by Sen. Pamela J. Althoff |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
55 | 5 | 5-43035 | Amended Code | Citation Text |