IL SB0015 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-15 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b).
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-08-15 - Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b).
Pending: Senate Assignments Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the Illinois Food, Farms, and Jobs Act. Makes a technical change in a Section concerning locally grown and organic food.
Title
AGRICULTURE-TECH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-08-15 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Re-referred to Assignments; Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b). | |
2009-08-15 | Pursuant to Senate Rule 3-9(b) / Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-31 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Held in Agriculture and Conservation | |
2009-03-30 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Assignments Refers to Agriculture and Conservation | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Referred to Assignments | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Floor Amendment No. 1 Filed with Secretary by Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2009-03-25 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. Heather Steans | |
2009-03-12 | Placed on Calendar Order of 2nd Reading March 17, 2009 | |
2009-03-12 | Do Pass Executive; 012-000-000 | |
2009-03-05 | Assigned to Executive | |
2009-02-20 | Added as Chief Co-Sponsor Sen. John J. Cullerton | |
2009-02-20 | Chief Sponsor Changed to Sen. Jacqueline Y. Collins | |
2009-01-30 | Referred to Assignments | |
2009-01-30 | First Reading | |
2009-01-30 | Filed with Secretary by Sen. John J. Cullerton |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=15&GAID=10&DocTypeID=SB&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/SB/09600SB0015.htm |