IL HR1293 | 2011-2012 | 97th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on January 8 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-01-08 - Session Sine Die
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requests that the State of Illinois Central Management Services' Business Enterprise Council include the equity ownership of silent investors of the same special classification in the calculations of the majority ownership of a company and to include silent investor equity when calculating control of a company when the silent investors have given controlling authority to one or more persons of that classification.
Title
CMS BEC EQUITY CALCULATIONS
Sponsors
Rep. Linda LaVia [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-08 | House | Session Sine Die |
2012-12-04 | House | Motion to Suspend Rule 25 - Prevailed by Voice Vote |
2012-12-04 | House | Motion Filed to Suspend Rule 25 Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee; Rep. Barbara Flynn Currie |
2012-12-03 | House | Assigned to Judiciary I - Civil Law Committee |
2012-11-27 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2012-11-20 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=1293&GAID=11&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=84&GA=97 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/97/HR/09700HR1293.htm |