IL HR0711 | 2023-2024 | 103rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on April 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
Pending: House State Government Administration Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 2:00 pm in Room 118
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 16 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Assigned to State Government Administration Committee
Pending: House State Government Administration Committee
Hearing: May 1 @ 2:00 pm in Room 118
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declares April 17, 2024 as Links Day in Illinois and congratulates Central Area Director Sheila R. Brown and the members on their unwavering commitment to service.
Title
LINKS DAY
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | House | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Justin Slaughter |
2024-04-17 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kimberly Du Buclet |
2024-04-17 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2024-04-16 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Rita Mayfield |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=711&GAID=17&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=112&GA=103 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/103/HR/10300HR0711.htm |