IL HR0459 | 2021-2022 | 102nd General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on October 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-25 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-0)
Status: Passed on October 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-10-25 - Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Commends Jessica Basham for her service to the House of Representatives and the State of Illinois.
Title
COMMEND-JESSICA BASHAM
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-25 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jay Hoffman |
2021-10-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anna Moeller |
2021-10-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2021-10-19 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2021-10-19 | House | Placed on Calendar Agreed Resolutions |
2021-10-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Lakesia Collins |
2021-10-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jennifer Gong-Gershowitz |
2021-10-19 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. William Davis |
2021-10-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Aaron M. Ortiz |
2021-10-18 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Will Guzzardi |
2021-10-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jaime M. Andrade, Jr. |
2021-10-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Katie Stuart |
2021-10-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sue Scherer |
2021-10-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Terra Costa Howard |
2021-10-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2021-10-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2021-10-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mark L. Walker |
2021-10-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Joyce Mason |
2021-10-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2021-10-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Dagmara Avelar |
2021-10-14 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Bob Morgan |
2021-09-27 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2021-09-21 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Greg Harris |
2021-09-17 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=459&GAID=16&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=110&GA=102 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/102/HR/10200HR0459.htm |