IL HR0363 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-07 - Resolution Adopted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Congratulates Robert A. Easter on the occasion of his retirement as President of the University of Illinois system.
Title
CONGRATS - ROBERT EASTER
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-07 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2015-05-07 | House | Added Co-Sponsor All Other Members of the House |
2015-05-06 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Al Riley |
2015-05-04 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2015-05-04 | House | Chief Sponsor Changed to Rep. Ron Sandack |
2015-04-29 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Carol Ammons |
2015-04-16 | House | Placed on Calendar Agreed Resolutions |
2015-04-15 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=363&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HR/09900HR0363.htm |