IL HR0289 | 2019-2020 | 101st General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 10 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-07-02 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges that the funding for the Invest in Kids program not be reduced.
Title
INVEST IN KIDS FUNDING
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-02 | House | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee |
2019-05-15 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Amy Grant |
2019-05-09 | House | To Income Tax Subcommittee |
2019-04-24 | House | Assigned to Revenue & Finance Committee |
2019-04-16 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Allen Skillicorn |
2019-04-11 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Elizabeth Hernandez |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Robert Rita |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jonathan Carroll |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Rita Mayfield |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Anthony DeLuca |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Kelly M. Burke |
2019-04-10 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Michael J. Zalewski |
2019-04-10 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. David McSweeney |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=289&GAID=15&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=108&GA=101 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/101/HR/10100HR0289.htm |