IL HR0224 | 2009-2010 | 96th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-12-01 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-12-01 - Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates the week of April 20-26, 2009 as "Navy Week" in the State of Illinois.
Title
NAVY WEEK
Sponsors
Rep. Keith Farnham [D] | Rep. LaShawn Ford [D] | Rep. Jack Franks [D] | Rep. Thomas Holbrook [D] |
Rep. Eddie Jackson [D] | Rep. Jack McGuire [D] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-12-01 | Rule 19(b) / Re-referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-05-30 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. LaShawn K. Ford | |
2009-05-07 | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack McGuire | |
2009-04-29 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Keith Farnham | |
2009-04-29 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Eddie Lee Jackson, Sr. | |
2009-04-29 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Jack D. Franks | |
2009-04-29 | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Ron Stephens | |
2009-04-20 | Assigned to State Government Administration Committee | |
2009-03-27 | Referred to Rules Committee | |
2009-03-26 | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Thomas Holbrook |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=224&GAID=10&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=76&GA=96 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/96/HR/09600HR0224.htm |