IL HR0198 | 2015-2016 | 99th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Passed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-5)
Status: Passed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates July of 2015 as Special Olympics Month in the State of Illinois.
Title
SPECIAL OLYMPICS MONTH
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Emanuel Chris Welch |
2015-04-28 | House | Resolution Adopted |
2015-04-21 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Linda Chapa LaVia |
2015-04-21 | House | Placed on Calendar Order of Resolutions |
2015-04-21 | House | Recommends Be Adopted Special Needs Services; 012-000-000 |
2015-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Tom Demmer |
2015-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Kathleen Willis |
2015-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Sam Yingling |
2015-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Natalie A. Manley |
2015-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Martin J. Moylan |
2015-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Stephanie A. Kifowit |
2015-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Deb Conroy |
2015-04-20 | House | Added Co-Sponsor Rep. Mary E. Flowers |
2015-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John D. Anthony |
2015-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Patricia R. Bellock |
2015-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. John Cavaletto |
2015-04-20 | House | Added Chief Co-Sponsor Rep. Dan Brady |
2015-03-23 | House | Assigned to Special Needs Services |
2015-02-26 | House | Referred to Rules Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Filed with the Clerk by Rep. Frances Ann Hurley |
Illinois State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/BillStatus.asp?DocNum=198&GAID=13&DocTypeID=HR&SessionID=88&GA=99 |
Text | https://www.ilga.gov/legislation/99/HR/09900HR0198.htm |